TX SB2518 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Somerset Municipal Utility District No. 3; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Somerset Municipal Utility District No. 3; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
SOMERSET MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 3
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility