TX SB2543 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Ranch at Cypress Creek Municipal Utility District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Ranch at Cypress Creek Municipal Utility District No. 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4671 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
RANCH AT CYPRESS CREEK MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2543 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02543I.htm |