TX SB2602 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Sandow Municipal Utility District No. 1; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Sandow Municipal Utility District No. 1; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5369 (Same As) 2023-06-11 - Effective immediately
HB5369 (Same As) 2023-06-11 - Effective immediately
HB5369 (Same As) 2023-06-11 - Effective immediately
Subjects
SANDOW MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2602 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02602I.htm |