TX SB287 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of terroristic threat.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of terroristic threat.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] |
Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
TERRORIST THREAT
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
TERRORIST THREAT