TX SB347 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of a driver's license suspension or disqualification following certain convictions.
Title
Relating to the extension of a driver's license suspension or disqualification following certain convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1308 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2008 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2008 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2008 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID