TX SB421 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 41-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the acquisition of real property by an entity with eminent domain authority.
Title
Relating to the acquisition of real property by an entity with eminent domain authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FA1 Kolkhorst (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FA1 Kolkhorst (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees with instructions |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion prevails |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion to instruct conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Morrison |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB991 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property