TX SB421 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the compensation and professional representation of student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletic programs at certain public and private institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the compensation and professional representation of student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletic programs at certain public and private institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB920 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Higher Education
HB1710 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Higher Education
HB1710 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB421 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00421I.htm |