TX SB453 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Title
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB768 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB453 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00453I.htm |