TX SB464 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Relating to reconstituting the system benefit fund as a trust fund and to uses of the fund.
Title
Relating to reconstituting the system benefit fund as a trust fund and to uses of the fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-13 | Filed | |
2009-01-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1698 (Same As) 2009-03-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Human Services--Direct Assistance
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric