TX SB528 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to the penalties prescribed for committing prostitution within a certain distance of certain designated places.
Title
Relating to the penalties prescribed for committing prostitution within a certain distance of certain designated places.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-01-23 | Filed | |
2009-01-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB724 (Similar To) 2009-04-08 - No action taken in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION