TX SB540 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain person to carry a handgun.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain person to carry a handgun.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4386 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
HB4386 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
HB4386 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB540 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00540I.htm |