TX SB579 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to an exception to the purchase of a refrigerant or equipment containing a refrigerant.
Title
Relating to an exception to the purchase of a refrigerant or equipment containing a refrigerant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed | |
2009-01-29 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION
Environment--Air
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION