TX SB620 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the state's goal for non-wind renewable electric generating capacity.
Title
Relating to the state's goal for non-wind renewable electric generating capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-02 | Filed | |
2009-02-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2850 (Similar To) 2009-04-02 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Energy--Conservation
Energy--Solar
Environment
Environment--General
RENEWABLE ENERGY
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Energy--Conservation
Energy--Solar
Environment
Environment--General
RENEWABLE ENERGY
Utilities
Utilities--Electric