TX SB620 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to student loan repayment assistance for speech-language pathologists or audiologists employed by a public school or as faculty members of certain programs at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to student loan repayment assistance for speech-language pathologists or audiologists employed by a public school or as faculty members of certain programs at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - SB 620Third Reading House (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDIOLOGISTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS
STUDENT LOANS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS
STUDENT LOANS