TX SB790 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - No action taken in committee
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to clinical practice hours available for professional nursing educational programs at certain hospitals.
Title
Relating to clinical practice hours available for professional nursing educational programs at certain hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed | |
2009-02-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Hospitals
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATEWIDE HEALTH COORDINATING COUNCIL
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Hospitals
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATEWIDE HEALTH COORDINATING COUNCIL