TX SB856 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-17 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-17 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consent to certain medical treatments by a surrogate decision-maker on behalf of certain inmates.
Title
Relating to consent to certain medical treatments by a surrogate decision-maker on behalf of certain inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-05-17 | Read first time | |
2011-05-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed | |
2011-02-22 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts