TX SB860 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to and benefits for mental health conditions and substance use disorders.
Title
Relating to access to and benefits for mental health conditions and substance use disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse