TX SB932 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to oyster beds and shells and an oyster shell recovery and replacement program.
Title
Relating to oyster beds and shells and an oyster shell recovery and replacement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-13 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Record vote | |
2011-04-13 | Passed | |
2011-04-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-13 | Record vote | |
2011-04-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-13 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-24 | Filed | |
2011-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General