TX SB972 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the taking of a defendant's bail bond by county jailers.
Title
Relating to the taking of a defendant's bail bond by county jailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-25 | Filed | |
2011-02-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BAIL BONDSMEN
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS