TX SB972 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain offenses relating to certain occupations regulated by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain offenses relating to certain occupations regulated by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - SB 972Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Effective immediately | |
2013-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-03 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Labor
Labor--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Labor--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety