TX SCR17 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Recognizing First Baptist Church in Blanco on the occasion of its 150th anniversary.
Title
Recognizing First Baptist Church in Blanco on the occasion of its 150th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-02-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-02-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-02-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-02-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-24 | House passage reported | |
2009-02-23 | Adopted | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-18 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Read & adopted | |
2009-02-11 | Filed | |
2009-02-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |