TX SCR2 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Commemorating the centennial of West Texas A&M University.
Title
Commemorating the centennial of West Texas A&M University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-01-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-01-27 | Signed in the House | |
2009-01-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-01-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-01-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-01-15 | Adopted | |
2009-01-15 | Laid before the House | |
2009-01-15 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-01-14 | Read & adopted | |
2009-01-06 | Filed | |
2009-01-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |