TX SCR3 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of John Byron Strait, Sr.
Title
In memory of John Byron Strait, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-06-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-06-24 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Filed |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |