TX SJR1 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to provide for a transfer of economic stabilization fund investment earnings to a special endowment fund in the state treasury.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to provide for a transfer of economic stabilization fund investment earnings to a special endowment fund in the state treasury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB69 (Enabled by) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR1 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00001I.htm |