TX SJR23 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment concerning the use of unencumbered surplus state revenues to provide for a rebate of state franchise taxes.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment concerning the use of unencumbered surplus state revenues to provide for a rebate of state franchise taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB331 (Enabled by) 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SJR23 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SJ00023I.htm |