TX SJR23 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the imposition of an individual income tax.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the imposition of an individual income tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR38 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR23 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00023I.htm |