TX SJR42 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize a political subdivision other than a school district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political subdivision may impose on the residence homesteads of persons who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize a political subdivision other than a school district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political subdivision may impose on the residence homesteads of persons who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR68 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Ways & Means
HJR68 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB830 (Enabled by) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HJR153 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Local Government
HJR68 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB830 (Enabled by) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HJR153 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SJR42 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SJ00042I.htm |