US HB1202 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
One Percent Spending Reduction Act of 2013 - Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to establish the aggregate projected outlay (outlay cap) (less net interest payments) for FY2014 at the FY2013 outlay cap (as estimated by the Congressional Budget Office [CBO] before March 2013), less 1%. Reduces each outlay cap for FY2015-FY2018 by 1% of the previous fiscal year's outlay cap (as estimated by CBO before March of such fiscal year). Requires the outlay cap for FY2019 and each subsequent fiscal year to be 18% of the CBO-estimated gross domestic product (GDP) for that calendar year. Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to make it out of order in both chambers to consider any bill, joint resolution, amendment, or conference report that includes any provision that would cause the most recently reported, current outlay cap to be exceeded. Prescribes procedures for waiver or suspension of this rule.
Title
One Percent Spending Reduction Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB547 (Related) 2013-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB1436 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB2495 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB1436 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB2495 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Economics and public finance
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
Budget process
Economics and public finance
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1202/BILLS-113hr1202ih.pdf |