US SB547 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
One Percent Spending Reduction Act of 2013 - Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to establish the aggregate outlay (outlay cap) (less net interest payments) for FY2014 at $3.329 trillion, less 1%. Reduces each outlay cap for FY2015-FY2016 by 1% of the previous fiscal year's outlay cap. Requires the outlay cap for FY2017 and each subsequent fiscal year to be 19% of the gross domestic product (GDP) for that fiscal year as estimated by the Office of Management and Budget (OMB). Prohibits the outlay caps from being less than those for the preceding fiscal year for FY2018 and any ensuing fiscal year. Requires a sequestration by OMB within 45 days after the beginning of a fiscal year to eliminate any excess outlay amount. Prescribes requirements for Congressional Budget Office (CBO) and OMB sequestration preview reports and an OMB final sequestration report, accompanied by a presidential order detailing uniform spending reductions equal to the excess outlay amount. Requires the House and the Senate budget committees to report a resolution directing the committees of their respective chambers to change existing law to achieve the spending reductions outlined in the OMB August 20 report to meet the outlay limits, if a sequestration is projected. States that if, after November 14, a bill resulting in outlays for the current fiscal year is enacted that causes excess outlays, the excess outlays for the next fiscal year shall be increased by the amount or amounts of that breach. Repeals provisions of the Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act terminating Pay-As-You-Go (PAYGO) enforcement mechanisms under such Act. Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to make it out of order in both chambers to consider any bill, joint resolution, amendment, or conference report that includes any provision that would cause the most recently reported, current outlay cap to be exceeded. Prescribes procedures for waiver or suspension of this rule.
Title
One Percent Spending Reduction Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1202 (Related) 2013-03-14 - Referred to House Rules
SB1436 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB2495 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB1436 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB2495 (Related) 2014-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Economics and public finance
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
Budget process
Economics and public finance
House of Representatives
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/547/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s547/BILLS-113s547is.pdf |