US HB1418 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that nothing in the McCarran-Ferguson Act modifies, impairs, or supersedes the operation of antitrust laws with respect to the business of health insurance, including the business of dental insurance. This declaration does not apply to a contract, combination, or conspiracy to (1) collect, compile, or disseminate historical loss data; (2) determine a loss development factor for historical loss data; (3) perform actuarial services if the collaboration does not involve a restraint of trade; or (4) develop or disseminate a standard insurance policy form if adherence to the form is not required. Prohibitions against unfair methods of competition apply to the business of health insurance without regard to whether the business is for profit.
Title
Competitive Health Insurance Reform Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-327. |
2021-01-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-01-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7929) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4571-4572) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1418. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4571-4573) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB350 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Competition and antitrust
Dental care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Insurance industry and regulation
Dental care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Insurance industry and regulation