US HB1761 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Against Child Exploitation Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill makes it a federal crime, subject to certain jurisdictional requirements, to: (1) knowingly produce or cause to be produced a visual depiction of a minor engaged in any sexually explicit conduct; (2) knowingly transmit a live depiction of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct; (3) have a minor assist any other person in producing or transmitting a depiction of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct; and (4) as parent or legal guardian, knowingly permit a minor to engage in sexually explicit conduct knowing that a visual depiction of such conduct will be produced or transmitted. The bill removes the "purpose" requirement for certain offenses involving the sexual exploitation of children occurring outside of the United States or within its territories or possessions. No criminal charges related to transmitting a live visual depiction of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct may be brought against an electronic communication service provider or remote computing service provider unless such provider has intentionally transmitted the visual depiction with actual knowledge of its content. (Sec. 3) Subject to certain exceptions, a civil claim or criminal charge against an electronic communication service provider, a remote computing service provider, or domain name registrar arising from the response to a search warrant or other legal process under various federal laws relating to sexual exploitation and other abuse of children may not be brought in any federal or state court.
Title
Protecting Against Child Exploitation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) H.Amdt.124 RC# 283 (Y: 180 N: 238 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - House - On passage RC# 284 (Y: 368 N: 51 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - On passage RC# 284 (Y: 368 N: 51 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-25 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 368 - 51 (Roll no. 284). (text: CR H4582-4583) |
2017-05-25 | House | H.Amdt.124 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 180 - 238 (Roll no. 283). |
2017-05-25 | House | H.Amdt.124 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2017-05-25 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 352, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson Lee amendment No. 1. |
2017-05-25 | House | H.Amdt.124 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Jackson Lee. (consideration: CR H4587-4590; text: CR H4587) |
2017-05-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1761. |
2017-05-25 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1973 and H.R. 1761. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017 through June 5, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 352. (consideration: CR H4582-4590) |
2017-05-24 | House | Rule H. Res. 352 passed House. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 352 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1973 and H.R. 1761. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017 through June 5, 2017. |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 86. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-137. |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR352 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6847 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6847 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses