US HB6847 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing Child Exploitation Act of 2018
Title
Preventing Child Exploitation Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8839-8841) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6847. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8839-8844) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mrs. Roby moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1761 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1842 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1862 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1842 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1862 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Military law
Pornography
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Military law
Pornography
Sex offenses
Violent crime