US HB22 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of Energy from sending petroleum products from the Strategic Petroleum Reserve to China, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting America’s Strategic Petroleum Reserve from China Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-12 - House - On Passage (Y: 331 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 4. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2023-01-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-01-12 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 331 - 97 (Roll no. 31). (text: CR H209) |
2023-01-12 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2023-01-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 22. |
2023-01-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H209-219) |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB9 (Same As) 2023-01-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB218 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR5 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB218 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR5 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.