US HB2398 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act - Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) from prohibiting or restricting U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) activities on federal land under their respective jurisdictions, located within 100 miles of an international land border, to: (1) execute search and rescue operations, and (2) prevent all unlawful entries into the United States through the international land borders of the United States. Grants CBP access to such lands to conduct the following activities: (1) road and barrier construction and maintenance; (2) use of patrol vehicles; (3) installation, maintenance, and operation of surveillance equipment and sensors; and (4) deployment of temporary tactical infrastructure. Provides that a waiver by the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) of specified laws regarding sections of the international border between the United States and Mexico and between the United States and Canada shall apply to all land under the jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture within 100 miles of the international land borders of the United States with respect to CBP activities under this Act. States that this Act shall not be construed to restrict legal use (grazing, hunting, mining, or public-use recreational and backcountry airstrips) on land under the jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture. States that: (1) this Act shall have no effect on state or private lands, and shall not provide authority on or access to state or private lands; and (2) nothing in this Act supersedes, replaces, negates, or diminishes treaties or other agreements between the United States and Indian tribes.
Title
To prohibit the Secretaries of the Interior and Agriculture from taking action on Federal lands that impede border security on such lands, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2013-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5137 (Related) 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB5230 (Related) 2014-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
SB2772 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 527.
HB5230 (Related) 2014-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
SB2772 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 527.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
General public lands matters
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Terrorism
Canada
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
General public lands matters
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2398/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2398/BILLS-113hr2398ih.pdf |