US HB2449 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to yardmaster employees the limitations on duty hours and the restrictions on communications to employees during their off-duty hours that are currently applicable to train employees. (A "yardmaster employee" means an individual responsible for supervising and coordinating the control of trains and engines operating within a rail yard.)
Title
Railroad Yardmaster Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Labor standards
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Worker safety and health
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2449/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2449/BILLS-116hr2449ih.pdf |