US HB2557 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prostate Cancer Misdiagnosis Elimination Act of 2017
Title
Prostate Cancer Misdiagnosis Elimination Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331. |
2017-12-06 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2017-12-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-449, Part I. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2067 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cancer
Genetics
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Genetics
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare