US HB2800 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-8)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit veterans to grant access to their records in the databases of the Veterans Benefits Administration to certain designated congressional employees, and for other purposes.
Title
WINGMAN Act Working to Integrate Networks Guaranteeing Member Access Now Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged. |
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2800/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2800/BILLS-117hr2800ih.pdf |