US HB2868 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Flood Insurance Program Policyholder Protection Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to limit the chargeable flood insurance premium for a residential property having 4 or fewer residences to no more than $10,000 a year, subject to adjustments for future inflation. (Sec. 3) In determining chargeable premium rates, the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall offer a rate reduction if policyholders implement specified mitigation methods. Mitigation techniques that qualify for such rate reduction include methods that can be utilized on a block or neighborhood scale, and the elevation of mechanical systems. (Sec. 4) FEMA shall conduct a study of the feasibility of providing coverage for individual units in cooperative housing projects.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Policyholder Protection Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148. |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-211. |
2017-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0. |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Cooperative and condominium housing
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices