US HB3005 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Joint Committee on the Library to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the United States Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library and to remove certain statues from areas of the United States Capitol which are accessible to the public, to remove all statues of individuals who voluntarily served the Confederate States of America from display in the United States Capitol, and for other purposes.
Title
To direct the Joint Committee on the Library to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the United States Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library and to remove certain statues from areas of the United States Capitol which are accessible to the public, to remove all statues of individuals who voluntarily served the Confederate States of America from display in the United States Capitol, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - On passage (Y: 285 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-29 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 285 - 120 (Roll no. 196). (text: CR H3263-3264) |
2021-06-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3290-3291) |
2021-06-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. R. 3005, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Loudermilk demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until a time to be announced. |
2021-06-29 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-06-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3005. |
2021-06-29 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2662, H.R. 3005, H.R. 3684 and H. Res. 503. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2662, under a structured rule; one hour of general debate on H.R. 3005, under a closed rule; 90 minutes of general debate on H.R. 3684; and one hour of general debate on H. Res. 503, under a closed rule. Resolution provides en bloc suspension authority. |
2021-06-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 504. (consideration: CR H3263-3276) |
2021-06-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 504 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2662, H.R. 3005, H.R. 3684 and H. Res. 503. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2662, under a structured rule; one hour of general debate on H.R. 3005, under a closed rule; 90 minutes of general debate on H.R. 3684; and one hour of general debate on H. Res. 503, under a closed rule. Resolution provides en bloc suspension authority. |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR504 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4216 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2366 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB5229 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-326.
HB4216 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2366 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB5229 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-326.