US HB3063 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal securities laws to enhance 403(b) plans, and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement Fairness for Charities and Educational Institutions Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251. |
2023-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-311. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 12. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2799 (Related) 2024-03-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.