US HB3304 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-53. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-53. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends for an additional four years the exemption from the means test under Chapter 7 bankruptcy for qualifying members of an Armed Forces reserve component or the National Guard. Specifically, members who, after September 11, 2001, are called to active duty or to perform a homeland defense activity for not less than 90 days qualify for this exemption. Currently, the exemption expires on December 19, 2019.
Title
National Guard and Reservists Debt Relief Extension Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 499 (Y: 417 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-53. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5321) |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 499). (text: CR H7216) |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7223-7224) |
2019-07-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3304. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7216-7217) |
2019-07-23 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-170. |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2128 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Homeland security
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Homeland security
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves