US HB3696 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wounded Warrior Workforce Enhancement Act This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to award grants to eligible institutions to: (1) establish a master's degree program in orthotics and prosthetics, or (2) expand upon an existing master's degree program in such area. The VA shall give grant priority to institutions that have entered into a partnership with a medical center administered by the VA or a facility administered by the Department of Defense. An "eligible institution" is an educational institution that is either accredited by the National Commission on Orthotic and Prosthetic Education or that demonstrates an ability to meet such accreditation requirements if it receives a grant. The bill requires the VA to award a grant to an institution with orthotic and prosthetic research and education experience to: (1) establish the Center of Excellence in Orthotic and Prosthetic Education; and (2) improve orthotic and prosthetic outcomes for veterans, members of the Armed Forces, and civilians by conducting orthotic and prosthetic research.
Title
Wounded Warrior Workforce Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1467 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3832-3833)
Subjects
Allied health services
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Medical research
Military medicine
Research administration and funding
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Medical research
Military medicine
Research administration and funding
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3696/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3696/BILLS-115hr3696ih.pdf |