US HB3973 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Faithful Execution of the Law Act of 2014 - Expands the circumstances under which the Attorney General is required to report to Congress regarding the enforcement of laws to include any instance in which the Attorney General, an officer of the Department of Justice (DOJ), or any other federal officer establishes or implements a policy to refrain from: (1) enforcing, applying, or administering any federal statute, rule, regulation, program, policy, or other law within the responsibility of the Attorney General or such officer; or (2) adhering to, enforcing, applying, or complying with, a final decision of any court of jurisdiction respecting the application of the Constitution, any statute, rule, regulation, program, policy, or other law within the responsibility of the Attorney General or such officer. (Currently, reports are not required with respect to the policies of other federal officers and reports concerning nonenforcement of a law are required only when the Attorney General or a DOJ officer refrains on grounds that the provision is unconstitutional.) Requires such reports to state the grounds for policies of nonenforcement.
Title
Faithful Execution of the Law Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - On Passage (Y: 244 N: 171 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 192 N: 225 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 191 N: 227 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 192 N: 225 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 191 N: 227 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-03-13 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 244 - 171 (Roll no. 129). |
2014-03-13 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 192 - 225 (Roll no. 128). (consideration: CR H2403) |
2014-03-13 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2403) |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lujan Grisham motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House with an amendment to ensure that the underlying bill does not apply to information that would pose a national security risk when dealing with terrorists, drug cartels, money launderers and foreign enemies of the United States. |
2014-03-13 | House | Ms. Lujan Grisham (NM) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (consideration: CR H2402-2404; text: CR H2402) |
2014-03-13 | House | H.AMDT.594 On agreeing to the Ellison amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 191 - 227 (Roll no. 127). (consideration: CR H2402) |
2014-03-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2401-2405) |
2014-03-13 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of an amendment which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2014-03-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further consideration of H.R. 3973 would be postponed. |
2014-03-12 | House | The previous question was ordered on the amendment and the bill pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H2348) |
2014-03-12 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 511, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ellison Part B amendment no. 1. |
2014-03-12 | House | H.AMDT.594 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Ellison. (consideration: CR H2347-2348; text: CR H2347)Amendment sought to waive reporting requirements provided in the bill if sufficient funds are not available to generate the increased volume of reports. |
2014-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3973. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4138 and H.R. 3973. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2014-03-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 511. (consideration: CR H2340-2348; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2340) |
2014-03-12 | House | Rule H. Res. 511 passed House. |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 511 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4138 and H.R. 3973. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 280. |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-376. |
2014-03-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 11. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-04 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged. |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR511 (Related) 2014-03-12 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 229 - 192 (Roll no. 119). (text: CR H2311)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Government operations and politics
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Government operations and politics