US HB4309 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Officer Safety Act of 2012 - Amends the federal judicial code to deem a law enforcement officer who is the defendant in a criminal prosecution to have been acting under the color of his office (thus authorizing removal of the case to U.S. district court) if the officer: (1) protected an individual in the officer's presence from a crime of violence; (2) provided immediate assistance to an individual who suffered, or who was threatened with, bodily harm; or (3) prevented the escape of any individual whom the officer reasonably believed to have committed, or was about to commit, in the officer's presence, a crime of violence that resulted in, or that was likely to result in, death or serious bodily injury.
Title
Officer Safety Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2276 (Same As) 2012-05-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
HB6622 (Related) 2012-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB4310 (Related) 2013-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 112-239.
SB3254 (Related) 2012-12-12 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 829, papers are returned to the Senate.
HB6622 (Related) 2012-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB4310 (Related) 2013-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 112-239.
SB3254 (Related) 2012-12-12 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 829, papers are returned to the Senate.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4309/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4309/BILLS-112hr4309ih.pdf |