US SB2276 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Officer Safety Act of 2012 - Amends the federal judicial code to deem a law enforcement officer who is the defendant in a criminal prosecution to have been acting under the color of his office (solely for purposes of determining the propriety of removal of the case to U.S. district court) if the officer: (1) protected an individual in the officer's presence from a crime of violence; (2) provided immediate assistance to an individual who suffered, or who was threatened with, bodily harm; or (3) prevented the escape of any individual whom the officer reasonably believed to have committed, or was about to commit, in the officer's presence, a crime of violence that resulted in, or that was likely to result in, death or serious bodily injury.
Title
Officer Safety Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413. |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2253-2254) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4309 (Same As) 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6622 (Related) 2012-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB4310 (Related) 2013-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 112-239.
SB3254 (Related) 2012-12-12 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 829, papers are returned to the Senate.
HB6622 (Related) 2012-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB4310 (Related) 2013-01-02 - Became Public Law No: 112-239.
SB3254 (Related) 2012-12-12 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 829, papers are returned to the Senate.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime