US HB5810 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Health HOME Act Medicaid Health Homes for Opioid-Use-Disorder Medicaid Enrollees Encouraged Act This bill extends the enhanced federal matching rate for expenditures regarding substance-use disorder health-home services under Medicaid. The bill also temporarily requires coverage of medication-assisted treatment under Medicaid.
Title
Medicaid Health HOME Act Medicaid Health Homes for Opioid-Use-Disorder Medicaid Enrollees Encouraged Act
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-727. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3384 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3384 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health
Health care quality
Medicaid
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Health
Health care quality
Medicaid