US HB6994 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit United States Government recognition of the Russian Federation's claim of sovereignty over any part of Ukraine (to include Crimea), its airspace, or its territorial waters, and for other purposes.
Title
Ukraine Sovereignty Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB922 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SB4937 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9059 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
SB4937 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9059 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6994/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6994/BILLS-117hr6994ih.pdf |