US HB6994 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the reopening of covered recreation sites closed due to a natural disaster, and for other purposes.
Title
Restoring Our Unopened Trails for Enjoyment and Safety Act ROUTES Act
Sponsors
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6994/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6994/BILLS-118hr6994ih.pdf |