US HB7153 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427. |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-514. |
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-01-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H299) |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3679 (Same As) 2024-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423.