US HB783 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Department of Energy Integrated Engineering Research Center Federal Building located at the Fermi National Accelerator Laboratory in Batavia, Illinois, as the "Helen Edwards Engineering Research Center".
Title
To designate the Department of Energy Integrated Engineering Research Center Federal Building located at the Fermi National Accelerator Laboratory in Batavia, Illinois, as the "Helen Edwards Engineering Research Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 32. |
2023-08-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-163. |
2023-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2023-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB241 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text: CR S231)